Harris et al v. Ajax Boiler, Inc. et al

Defendant: Spirax Sarco Company, Inc., Trane U.S., Inc., Union Carbide Corporation, Weil-McLain, Inc., Yarway Corporation, Zurn Industries, Champlain Cable Company, Crane Co., Foster-Wheeler Energy Corporation, Georgia-Pacific, LLC, Hajoca Corporation, Riley Power, Inc.,, Oakfabco, Inc., John Crane Co., Ingersoll-Rand Company, Hercules, Inc., Burnham Corporation, Cleaver Brooks, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Ametek, Inc., Ajax Boiler, Inc. and American Standard, Inc.
Plaintiff: Billy David Harris and Robin L. Harris
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00311
Filed: October 1, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Gaston
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2013 106 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER this action is hereby STAYED as to Defendant Yarway Corporation only, re 105 Suggestion of Bankruptcy. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 09/21/13. (emw)
September 23, 2013 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this action is hereby STAYED as to Defendant Yarway Corporation only. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 09/21/2013. (thh)
October 25, 2013 110 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting without Prejudice 109 Motion to Dismiss Defendant John Crane, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/25/2013. (thh)
November 1, 2013 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 113 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/01/13. (emw)
November 1, 2013 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 112 Motion to Dismiss Ingersoll Rand Company without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/01/13. (emw)
December 31, 2013 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 121 Motion for Order Governing Release of Pathology Materials. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/30/2013. (khm)
January 8, 2014 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 123 Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Set Aside or for Reconsideration of Order Governing Release of Pathology Materials. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 01/08/14. (emw)
February 19, 2014 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 132 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Scott E. Frick for Union Carbide Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/19/14. (ejb)
February 19, 2014 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 131 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Moffatt G. McDonald for Union Carbide Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/19/14. (ejb)
February 19, 2014 136 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 133 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added W. David Conner for Union Carbide Corp. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/19/14. (ejb)
April 8, 2014 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 126 Duke University Heath System, Inc.'s Motion for Protective Order and Motion to Set Aside of for Reconsideration of Order governing Release of Pathology Materials. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/07/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit) (thh)
June 2, 2014 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 160 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jason M. Saul for Riley Power, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/2/14. (khm)
June 17, 2014 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 170 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Christopher Norris for Billy David Harris & Robin L. Harris. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/17/14. (ejb)
July 7, 2014 180 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER AND OPINION granting 146 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting 149 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting 151 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting 156 Motion for Summary Judgment. defendant Cran e Co., individually and as successor-in-interest to both National U.S. Radiator and Pacific Steel Boiler; defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to both Aquachem and Nebraska Boiler Division; defendant Riley Power, Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to Babcock Borsig Power, Inc., Riley Stoker Corporation, and D.B. Riley; and, defendant Trane U.S. Inc., individually and as successor-in-interest to both American Standard, Inc., and American Radiator and Standard Sanitary Corporation, are hereby DISMISSED from this matter. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/3/2014. (tmg)
July 18, 2014 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 181 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Roderick Scott Marshall for Robin L. Harris. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 07/17/14. (emw)
July 21, 2014 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 182 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Katherine W. Binns for Georgia-Pacific, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 07/18/14. (emw)
July 21, 2014 186 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 183 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Maria K. Karos for Georgia-Pacific, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 07/18/2014. (thh)
October 26, 2012 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Barrett Naman for Billy David Harris,Barrett Naman for Robin L. Harris. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/26/2012. (thh)
August 15, 2014 214 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 212 Joint Motion to Dismiss all claims of Robin Harris, individually and as executrix of the estate of Billy David Harris, against Deft Union Carbide Corporation with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/15/14. (ejb)
January 23, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added E. Elaine Shofner for Champlain Cable Company, Hercules, Inc. and Riley Power, Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 01/19/13. (emw)
February 5, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before fifteen (15) days from entry of this Order, the Plaintiff shall show cause why service has not been effected on American Standard, Inc., Ametek, Inc. and Trane U.S., Inc. individually and as successor-in-interest to American Radiator & Standard Sanitary Manufacturing Company. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/04/13. (emw)
February 7, 2013 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING Conditional Transfer Order 539 re: MDL 875 Asbestos Litigation. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 2/7/13. (Attachments: # 1 CTO 539)(ejb)
March 5, 2013 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 61 Motion to Dismiss with prejudice as to Defendants Ametek, Inc., Hercules, Inc. and Champlain Cable Corporation. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/05/2013. (thh)
April 1, 2013 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 72 Defendant Spirax Sarco Company, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/30/2013. (thh)
April 12, 2013 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 67 Joint Motion to Dismiss Foster Wheeler. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/11/2013. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Harris et al v. Ajax Boiler, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco Company, Inc.
Represented By: John Thomas Holden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane U.S., Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil-McLain, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarway Corporation
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Champlain Cable Company
Represented By: Teresa E. Lazzaroni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Represented By: Tracy Edward Tomlin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster-Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer M. Techman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Georgia-Pacific, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hajoca Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.,
Represented By: Teresa E. Lazzaroni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakfabco, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Co.
Represented By: Edward K. Brooks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hercules, Inc.
Represented By: Teresa E. Lazzaroni
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver Brooks, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ametek, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajax Boiler, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Standard, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy David Harris
Represented By: Barrett Naman
Represented By: Cathy Anne Williams
Represented By: William M. Graham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin L. Harris
Represented By: Cathy Anne Williams
Represented By: Barrett Naman
Represented By: William M. Graham
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]