McAdoo v. United States of America et al

Defendant: Ann Padgett, Joyce Ann Nash, United States of America, Sonny W. Tucker, Jr., Sandy F. Pierce, Rutherford County Department of Social Services, John Carroll and Vic Martin
Plaintiff: Carl E. McAdoo
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00328
Filed: October 19, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 13, 2012 24 Featured Case ORDER denying 10 Pltf's Motion for Default Judgment as to Deft. Joyce Ann Nash; granting 11 Deft Joyce Ann Nash's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; denying as moot 19 Deft Joyce Ann Nash's Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/11/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
February 27, 2013 38 Featured Case ORDER granting Pltf's 30 & 36 Motions to Seal Exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/27/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
May 3, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER that the Plaintiff shall have until May 20, 2013, to file an Amended Complaint that complies with this Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 05/02/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
May 28, 2013 44 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot 17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying as moot 22 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 05/28/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
May 28, 2013 45 Featured Case ORDER granting 42 Motion to Seal 41 Exhibits 1-30 of 40 Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 05/28/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw) Modified text on 5/28/2013 (emw). NEF regenerated.
June 27, 2013 56 Featured Case ORDER striking 51 Response & 52 Sealed Exhibits; denying as moot 53 Motion to Restrict Exhibit 3, 54 Motion to Corrected Motion and 55 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until July 10, 2013, to f ile a response to the Motions to Dismiss that complies with the prior Orders of this Court and the Local Rules of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 06/26/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh) Modified text on 6/27/2013 (ejb).
February 3, 2014 63 Featured Case ORDER directing Pltf obtain counsel by 3/5/2013; upon entry of an appearance by counsel, the Court will allow counsel 20 days to file an amended complaint; if Pltf fails to comply with this Order and obtain counsel within time allowed, the Court will recommend the District Court dismiss this action in its entirety without prejudice; and pending 48 & 50 Motions to Dismiss are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/3/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
March 12, 2014 65 Featured Case ORDER denying 64 Motion for Reconsideration re 63 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/12/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
March 17, 2014 66 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/15/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
March 17, 2014 67 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 03/17/14. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
August 28, 2014 75 Featured Case ORDER denying as moot the 73 Motion to Strike and 74 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer re: 72 Amended Complaint. The Court STRIKES the 72 Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 08/28/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(klb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McAdoo v. United States of America et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ann Padgett
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Ann Nash
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sonny W. Tucker, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandy F. Pierce
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rutherford County Department of Social Services
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Carroll
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vic Martin
Represented By: Sean F. Perrin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl E. McAdoo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]