Starnes, et al v. A.O. Smith Corporation, et al

Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc., Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, CBS Corporation, Carrier Corporation, BW/IP International, Inc., Burnham LLC, Blackmer Pump Company, American Cast Iron Pipe Company, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, A.O. Smith Corporation, General Electric Company, Zurn Industries, LLC, Yarway Corporation, Xylem, Inc., Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc., Weil-McLain, Watts Water Technologies, Inc., Warren Pumps, LLC, Viking Pump, Inc., Viad Corporation, Union Carbide Corporation, Trane US, Inc., Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC, The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Goulds Pumps, Inc., Grinnell LLC, Henry Pratt Company, LLC, Honeywell International, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., Ingersoll Rand Company, Invensys Systems, Inc., Jerguson Gage & Valve Company, John Crane, Inc., Johnston Boiler Company, Kohler Co., Laars Heating Systems Co., McWane Inc.,, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, O.C. Keckley Company, Oakfabco, Inc., Peerless Industries, Inc., Rheem Manufacturing Company, Riley Power, Inc.,, Robertshaw Controls Co., Spirax Sarco, Inc., Cleaver-Brooks, Inc., Clow Valve Company, Compudyne Corporation, Crane Co., Crane Environmental, Inc., Crosby Valve, Inc., Crown Boiler Company, Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc., Dover Corporation, ECR International, Inc., Elliott Turbo Machinery Company, Fisher Controls International, LLC, Flowserve Corporation, Flowserve US, Inc. and FMC Corporation
Plaintiff: Betty Starnes and Ralph Oneil Starnes
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv00360
Filed: November 12, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Union
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
January 16, 2013 117 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 98 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Elisabeth Cheatham Bond for Riley Power, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/16/13. (nll)
January 25, 2013 161 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 135 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Robert F. Redmond for Invensys Systems, Inc.,. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 01/24/2013. (thh)
January 25, 2013 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 152 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Eric T. Hawkins for Rheem Manufacturing Company,. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 01/24/2013. (thh)
April 16, 2013 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 174 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/12/2013. (thh)
April 16, 2013 197 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 133 Motion to Dismiss; granting 175 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. The Plaintiffs shall file their Amended Complaint within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/12/2013. (thh)
May 23, 2013 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 267 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Cathy R. Gordon for Honeywell International, Inc.. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/22/2013. (thh)
June 13, 2013 281 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 278 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kenneth S. Mroz for Honeywell International, Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/12/13. (nll)
August 16, 2013 284 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before September 6, 2013, the Defendant Henry Pratt Company, LLC shall file a response disclosing the names and citizenships, if any, of all the constituent members or partners of Henry Pratt Company, LLC and for any such constituent members or partners that is a limited liability companys or partnerships shall identify the citizenships of the respective constituent members or partners until all such constituents are fully identified. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/16/13. (nll)
August 16, 2013 285 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDERED that the Plaintiffs, on or before September 6, 2013 shall advise the Court as to whether or not service has been obtained on the defendants named above. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/16/13. (khm)
September 25, 2013 300 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 299 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Clement D. Carter for Blackmer Pump Company, Dover Corporation and Invensys Systems, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 09/25/2013. (thh)
November 5, 2013 308 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 307 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Nichols J. Zidik for Honeywell International, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/05/13. (emw)
December 2, 2013 314 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 312 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Kevin W. Paul for Betty Starnes & Ralph Oneil Starnes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/2/13. (ejb)
December 4, 2013 315 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 313 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Raja Shankar Mishra for Blackmer Pump Company and Invensys Systems, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/04/2013. (thh)
February 4, 2014 320 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 317 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Blackmer Pump Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; denying as moot 250 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/04/2014. (thh)
February 4, 2014 321 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 318 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Invensys Systems, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; denying as moot 249 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/04/2014. (thh)
February 4, 2014 322 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 316 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Henry Pratt Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/04/2014. (thh)
February 24, 2014 329 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 326 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Moffatt G. McDonald for Goulds Pumps, Inc., ITT Corporation, Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., and Xylem, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 02/21/14. (emw)
February 24, 2014 330 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 327 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Scott E. Frick for Goulds Pumps, Inc., ITT Corporation, Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., and Xylem, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 02/21/14. (emw)
February 24, 2014 331 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 328 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added W. David Conner for Goulds Pumps, Inc., ITT Corporation, Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc., and Xylem, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 02/21/14. (emw)
March 4, 2014 334 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 332 Motion to Dismiss as to all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Dover Corporation and denying as moot 251 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/04/14. (emw)
March 18, 2014 336 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties' Motion 335 is GRANTED, and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Crown Boiler Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/18/2014. (thh)
March 31, 2014 339 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 338 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant O.C. Keckley Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/28/14. (emw)
March 31, 2014 340 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 337 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/28/14. (emw)
April 4, 2014 349 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 341 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Laars Heating Systems Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/4/2014. (tmg)
April 4, 2014 350 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 342 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Rheem Manufacturing Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/4/2014. (tmg)
April 4, 2014 351 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 343 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Burnham LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/4/2014. (tmg)
April 4, 2014 352 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 344 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/4/2014. (tmg)
April 4, 2014 353 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 345 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Oakfabco, Inc are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/4/2014. (tmg)
April 4, 2014 354 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 346 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Flowserve Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/4/2014. (tmg)
April 4, 2014 355 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 347 Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Johnston Boiler Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/4/2014. (tmg)
April 8, 2014 359 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 348 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/07/14. (emw)
April 9, 2014 362 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 360 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs claims against Defendant McWane, Inc., as successor in interest to Clow Corporation and its Clow Valve Division, sued as Clow Valve Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/09/14. (emw) Modified text on 4/9/2014 (emw).
April 9, 2014 363 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 361 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant McWane, Inc., sued as successor-in-interest to Kennedy Valve Manufacturing Company, Kennedy Valve, Inc., and Kennedy Valve Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/09/14. (emw) Modified text on 4/9/2014 (emw).
May 8, 2014 365 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 364 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Georgia-Pacific, LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/08/14. (emw)
May 15, 2014 371 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 366 Joint Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/15/2014. (thh)
May 15, 2014 372 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 367 Joint Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Honeywell International Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/15/2014. (thh)
May 20, 2014 374 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 373 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant American Cast Iron Pipe Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/19/14. (emw)
May 27, 2014 376 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 375 Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/26/14. (emw) Modified text on 5/27/2014. NEF Regenerated (khm).
May 28, 2014 378 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 377 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Riley Power Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/28/14. (emw)
June 6, 2014 382 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 380 Motion to Dismiss and all of plaintiffs' claims against defendant A.O. Smith Corporation are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/6/2014. (eef)
June 6, 2014 383 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 379 Motion to Dismiss, and all of the Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Spirax Sarco, Inc. (incorrectly sued as Spirax Sarco Company, Inc.), individually and as successor-in-interest to Sarco Company, Inc., and Defendant Jerguson Gage & Valve, a division of Clark-Reliance Corporation (incorrectly named herein as Jerguson Gage & Valve Company), are hereby DISMISSED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/6/2014. (eef)
June 6, 2014 384 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 381 Motion to Dismiss, and all of the Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Weil-McLain are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/6/2014. (eef)
June 6, 2014 388 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 386 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Robertshaw Controls Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/06/14. (emw)
June 6, 2014 389 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 385 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant IMO Industries, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/06/14. (emw)
June 9, 2014 391 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 387 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/07/14. (emw)
June 11, 2014 397 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 392 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Fisher Controls International LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/11/2014. (thh)
June 11, 2014 398 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 393 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Gould Pumps, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/11/2014. (thh)
June 11, 2014 399 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 395 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Kaiser Gypsum Company, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/11/2014. (thh)
June 11, 2014 400 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 394 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and all of the Plaintiffs claims against Defendant ITT Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/11/2014. (thh)
June 11, 2014 401 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 396 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Xylem, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/11/2014. (thh)
June 17, 2014 404 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 403 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant Viking Pump, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/16/14. (emw)
July 2, 2014 421 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 406 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant CBS Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 07/02/14. (emw)
July 2, 2014 422 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 405 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against Defendant John Crane Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/2/14. (nv) Modified filed date on 7/3/2014 (nv).
January 11, 2013 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 78 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Tiffany N. Dickenson for Betty Starnes, Tiffany N. Dickenson for Ralph Oneil Starnes. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 01/11/13. (Copy sent via email to atty, Dickenson). (emw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Starnes, et al v. A.O. Smith Corporation, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrier Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BW/IP International, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burnham LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blackmer Pump Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Cast Iron Pipe Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarway Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xylem, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weir Valves & Controls USA, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Weil-McLain
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watts Water Technologies, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viad Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trane US, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Fluid Systems (USA), LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grinnell LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Pratt Company, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll Rand Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Invensys Systems, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jerguson Gage & Valve Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnston Boiler Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kohler Co.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laars Heating Systems Co.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McWane Inc.,
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O.C. Keckley Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oakfabco, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Peerless Industries, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rheem Manufacturing Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riley Power, Inc.,
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robertshaw Controls Co.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spirax Sarco, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clow Valve Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compudyne Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Environmental, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Boiler Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal Company, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dover Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ECR International, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elliott Turbo Machinery Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisher Controls International, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Starnes
Represented By: Janet Ward Black
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Oneil Starnes
Represented By: Janet Ward Black
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]