A.B. v. Burke County Public Schools Board of Education et al

Defendant: Linda Bradshaw, Burke County Public Schools Board of Education, Michael Andrew Alexander and John Roes
Plaintiff: A.B
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00009
Filed: January 14, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Burke
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28:1343 Violation of Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Douglas E Fierberg for A.B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 03/11/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
March 12, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added James W Saffell for A.B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 03/11/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
March 12, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Peter C. Grenier for A.B. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 03/11/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
March 25, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER directing Plaintiff's counsel to produce documents by 4/8/13 re: appointment as Guardian Ad Litem. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/25/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(bsw)
April 8, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and reserving for decision by the District Court in part 7 MOTION to Consolidate this Case with 1:12-cv-00334; joining 1:13cv09 & 1:12-cv-334 for the purposes of discovery and reserving the decision as to whether or not to grant Defts' motion for consolidation for trial to the District Court, to be determined after the completion of discovery in these two cases. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 4/5/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
June 3, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part without prejudice 7 Motion to Consolidate this Case with 1:12cv334. Either party may file renewed motion to consolidate this case for trial within 20 days of the close of discovery. At that time, the District Court can determine whether or not to consolidate case for trial. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
November 26, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER granting 31 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/26/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
December 6, 2013 48 Featured Case ORDER granting 44 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/6/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
April 26, 2014 65 Featured Case ORDER that Plaintiffs shall have 30 days from the entry of this Order to file motions for approval of the minor settlements. In light of the parties' settlement of the claims pending against Defendants Burke County Publ ic Schools Board of Education and Linda Bradshaw, the pretrial conference currently scheduled for April 29, 2014 is CANCELLED, and these cases are CONTINUED from the May 12, 2014 trial calendar. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/25/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: A.B. v. Burke County Public Schools Board of Education et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Linda Bradshaw
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burke County Public Schools Board of Education
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Andrew Alexander
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Roes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.B
Represented By: Robert M. Tatum
Represented By: Laura E. Conner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]