Clean Control Corporation v. Simpson

Plaintiff: Clean Control Corporation
Defendant: Terry D. Simpson
Case Number: 1:2013cv00031
Filed: February 4, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion to Dismiss. FURTHER ORDERED that on or before fifteen (15) days from entry of this Order, the Defendant shall file Answer or otherwise make appearance in this action in compliance with all applicable rules of practice and procedure. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/25/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(emw)
August 14, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT JUDGMENT AND PERMANENT INJUNCTION in favor of Clean Control Corporation against Terry D. Simpson. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 08/13/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
February 13, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Stephen J. Zralek for Clean Control Corporation. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/13/2013. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clean Control Corporation v. Simpson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clean Control Corporation
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Euler
Represented By: Joseph Pinckney McGuire
Represented By: Emily L. Nenni
Represented By: Stephen J. Zralek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terry D. Simpson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]