Taylor v. Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.

Defendant: Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Eric Taylor
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00056
Filed: March 1, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2013 15 Featured Case ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Amy Harmon Geddes for Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/25/13. (nll)
March 27, 2014 16 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER denying 7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/26/2014. (thh)
May 8, 2014 17 Featured Case ORDER that the parties shall conduct an initial attorneys conference as soon as practicable but no later than seven (7) days from the entry of this Order. The parties shall file a certificate of initial attorneys conference with the Court no later than seven (7) days thereafter. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/08/14. (emw)
March 20, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Scott M. Hendler for Richard Eric Taylor. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/19/2013. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Taylor v. Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alcatel-Lucent USA, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Eric Taylor
Represented By: Scott M. Hendler
Represented By: Mona Lisa Wallace
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]