Davis v. Scope Services

Plaintiff: Sonya M. Davis
Defendant: Scope Services
Case Number: 1:2013cv00058
Filed: March 6, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Henderson
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 30, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER directing the parties to appear for a status conference. ( Status Conference set for 8/9/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom 2, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 07/30/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
August 20, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Deft's 15 Report on Selection of Mediator and Joint Stipulation of Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge (#15), being considered as a motion, is ALLOWED and Clifford C. Marshall, Jr. is named as the mediator in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/20/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
August 21, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 17 Deft's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/21/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)
December 31, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 21 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution; denying as moot 26 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/30/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(thh)
January 30, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that a Status Conference is set for 2/7/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 100 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell, to determine why the stipulation of dismissal of this matter has not been filed; should the stipulation of dismissal be filed before that date, the hearing shall be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/30/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Scope Services
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya M. Davis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scope Services
Represented By: James M. Dedman, IV
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]