i play. inc. v. Winc Design Limited et al

Defendant: Pure Precision Limited and Winc Design Limited
Plaintiff: i play. inc.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00062
Filed: March 8, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:145 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added D. Margeaux Thomas for Pure Precision Limited. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/1/13. (nll)
July 2, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Eric G. King for Pure Precision Limited. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/1/13. (nll)
July 2, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kurt C. Rommel for Pure Precision Limited. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/1/13. (nll)
August 29, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Plaintiff shall show good cause within fourteen (14) days of service of this Order for the failure to effect service on the Defendant Winc Design Limited.Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/28/2013. (khm)
September 23, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot 21 Motion to Amend/Correct. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Show Cause Order [Doc. 17] is hereby DISCHARGED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 09/21/13. (emw)
October 28, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply and Stay Proceedings, and all deadlines in this matter are hereby STAYED for a period of sixty (60) days. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/28/13. (khm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: i play. inc. v. Winc Design Limited et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pure Precision Limited
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winc Design Limited
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: i play. inc.
Represented By: David Matthew Wilkerson
Represented By: Steven C. Schnedler
Represented By: Larry Stephen McDevitt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]