McKinnish v. Donahoe

Plaintiff: Kimberly J. McKinnish
Defendant: Patrick R. Donahoe
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00087
Filed: March 28, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Henderson
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 17, 2013 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Christopher D. Vaughn for Kimberly J. McKinnish. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 09/17/2013. (thh)
September 23, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER that the Show Cause Order 5 is hereby DISCHARGED, and this civil action will be allowed to proceed. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 09/21/2013. (thh)
October 2, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 Motion to Stay these proceedings pending the restoration of appropriations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/02/2013. (thh)
January 17, 2014 23 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/17/14. (emw)
June 9, 2014 31 Featured Case ORDER that the Clerk of Court calendar defendants Motion for Summary Judgment 24 for oral arguments on the next available civil hearing day in Asheville. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. on 6/9/2014. (khm)
August 15, 2014 36 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF DECISION and ORDER granting Defendant's 24 Motion for Summary Judgment and this action is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. on 8/15/14. (khm)
August 15, 2014 37 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 8/15/14. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (khm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McKinnish v. Donahoe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly J. McKinnish
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick R. Donahoe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]