Esposito v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Joseph Esposito
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00098
Filed: April 5, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Cleveland
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1001 E.R.I.S.A.
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion to Dismiss; denying 12 Motion to Dismiss; granting 14 Motion to Amend/Correct Complaint. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 6/12/13. (nll)
August 19, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM ORDER AND OPINION re 27 Joint MOTION to Strike is DENIED as moot. Dfts' 19 MOTION to Dismiss (or alternatively, for Judgment on the Pleadings) as to Plaintiff's Third through Sixth Causes of A ction in Amended Complaint and 22 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike Plaintiff's Jury Demand are DENIED as moot. Dft's 19 MOTION to Dismiss as to Plaintiff's Third through Sixth Causes of Action in Amended Complain t is GRANTED. 22 MOTION to Dismiss and to Strike Plaintiff's Jury Demand is GRANTED. Wal-Mart is TERMINATED. Dft's 20 MOTION to Strike Jury Demand in Plaintiff's Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/19/2014. (klb)
May 23, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 & 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added J. Gordon Howard and Thomas H. Lawrence for Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/22/2013. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Esposito v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Esposito
Represented By: John Elliott Rogers, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Boyd Alexander Correll, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Katherine T. Lange
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]