Gentry v. Maggie Valley Resort Management, LLC et al

Defendant: Jay Manner, Maggie Valley Resort Management, LLC and East West Partners Club Management Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Judith Gentry
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00108
Filed: April 17, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Haywood
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans With Disability Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 15, 2014 160 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Pla Judith Gentry against East West Partners Club Management Company, Inc., Jay Manner. Judgment entered in favor of Dft Maggie Valley Resort Management, LLC against Pla Judith Gentry. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 09/15/2014. (klb)
December 18, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 & 27 Motions to Seal Documents re 22 Sealed Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, 23 Sealed Affidavit in Opposition to Motion and 28 Sealed Reply to Response to Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/18/13. (ejb)
December 23, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 36 Motion to Seal Document. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/23/13. (emw)
December 31, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 38 MOTION for Protective Order . The Court DIRECTS the parties that it will hear argument on the pending motion at the previously scheduled hearing on January 6, 2014, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 2 at the United States District Court Western District of North Carolina, Asheville Division, 100 Otis Street, Asheville, North Carolina. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/31/13. (emw)
January 9, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 38 Motion for Protective Order; granting 18 Motion for Protective Order; granting 18 Motion to Quash. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/09/14. (emw)
March 10, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 Motion for Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/10/2014. (tmg)
March 11, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 52 Motion to Quash the subpoena issued to Honours Group. The Court DIRECTS Honours Group that it need not respond to the subpoena and need not produce the materials requested by Plaintiff in the subpoena. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 03/11/2014. (thh)
April 9, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 66 Motion to Seal Documents Documents 71 & 72 . Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/9/14. (ejb)
June 9, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk of Court schedule MVRM's 57 Motion for Summary Judgment, 61 EWPCMC, Defendant Manner's Motion for Summary Judgment, and defendants' 78 joint Motion to Strike for oral arguments at the court's next available hearing day in Asheville. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr. on 6/9/2014. (khm)
August 11, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 57 Motion for Summary Judgment, 61 Motion for Summary Judgment and 78 Motion to Strike. Allowing 91 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time. Parties may make such exchange of disclosures not later than the Final Pretrial Conference. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 8/11/2014. (nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gentry v. Maggie Valley Resort Management, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Manner
Represented By: David Hampton Tyner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maggie Valley Resort Management, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan W. Yarbrough
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East West Partners Club Management Company, Inc.
Represented By: David Hampton Tyner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judith Gentry
Represented By: Glen C. Shults
Represented By: Linda E. Vespereny
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]