Hutto et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Donald Lee Hutto and Sandra Seay Hutto
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, A.O. Smith Corporation, A.W. Chesterton, Inc., Clark-Reliance Corporation, Crane Co. - Cochrane and Chapman Valve Co., Crane Co. - Chempump, Crane Co. - Stockham Valve, Crosby Valve, Inc., Flowserve Corporation - Aldrich Pump Company, Flowserve Corporation - Byron Jackson Pump Company, Flowserve Corporation - Worcester Valve Co., Flowserve Corporation - Pacific Pumps, Flowserve US Inc., Gardner Denver, Inc., Goulds Pumps, Inc., Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc., Ingersoll-Rand Company, ITT Corporation, SFS (USA) Holding Inc., United Conveyor Corporation, Yarway Corporation and Zurn Industries
Cross_claimant: A.W. Chesterton, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00109
Filed: April 17, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Asbestos Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 10, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 98 , 99 & 100 Motions for Leave to Appear by special admission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/10/14. (ejb)
February 20, 2014 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 111 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Moffatt G. McDonald for Goulds Pumps, Inc. & ITT Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/20/14. (ejb)
February 20, 2014 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 112 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Scott E. Frick for Goulds Pumps, Inc. & ITT Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/20/14. (ejb)
February 20, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 113 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added W. David Conner for Goulds Pumps, Inc. & ITT Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/20/14. (ejb)
April 21, 2014 153 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 150 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant Ingersoll Rand Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/21/2014. (thh)
April 21, 2014 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 149 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant Flowserve Corporation, only in its capacity as successor in interest to Aldrich Pump Company, are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/21/2014. (thh)
April 21, 2014 155 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 152 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against the aforementioned Defendant are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/21/2014. (thh)
April 21, 2014 156 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 151 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant United Conveyor Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 04/21/2014. (thh)
May 8, 2014 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the parties shall provide a status report within seven (7) days of the entry of this Order advising the Court of the result of the parties' mediation. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 05/08/14. (emw)
June 9, 2014 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying in part and allowing in part 161 Motion to Stay. The 161 Motion to Stay is DENIED, but the portion of the motion requesting the entry of a Second Amended Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan is ALLOWED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/9/2014. (khm)
June 17, 2014 167 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 166 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant Green Tweed & Co. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/16/14. (emw)
June 17, 2014 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 165 Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant A.O. Smith Corporation are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/16/14. (emw)
June 20, 2014 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 169 Joint Motion to Dismiss, and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant A.W. Chesterton Company are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/19/2014. (thh)
June 20, 2014 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 170 Joint Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant Crosby Valve, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/19/2014. (thh)
June 24, 2014 174 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 173 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant Zurn Industries, LLC. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 06/24/2014. (klb)
October 2, 2014 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 184 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time of Scheduling Order Deadlines. (Discovery due by 10/31/2014, Summary judgment deadline 11/15/2014. Discovery motions due by 10/15/2014). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/02/2014. (klb)
October 14, 2014 191 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 186 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added John Michael Fitzpatrick for General Electric Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/14/14. (ejb)
October 14, 2014 192 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 187 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Carol A Zuckerman for Airco Welders Supply (Linde LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, formerly known as The BOC Group, Inc. and/or Airco, Inc., and improperly sued and served herein as "Airco Welders Supply"). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/14/14. (ejb)
October 14, 2014 193 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 188 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Clare M. Maisano for Airco Welders Supply (Linde LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, formerly known as The BOC Group, Inc. and/or Airco, Inc., and improperly sued and served herein as "Airco Welders Supply"). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/14/14. (ejb)
October 14, 2014 194 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 189 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Edward F. Houff for Airco Welders Supply (Linde LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, formerly known as The BOC Group, Inc. and/or Airco, Inc., and improperly sued and served herein as "Airco Welders Supply"). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/14/14. (ejb)
October 14, 2014 195 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 190 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Philip A. Kulinski for Airco Welders Supply (Linde LLC, a Delaware limited liability company, formerly known as The BOC Group, Inc. and/or Airco, Inc., and improperly sued and served herein as "Airco Welders Supply"). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/14/14. (ejb)
November 26, 2014 218 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 217 Motion to Dismiss. Plas claims against the Defendant NIBCO, Inc. are hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/26/2014. (klb)
December 23, 2014 226 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 225 Motion to Dismiss. All of Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Linde LLC, a Delaware Corporation, formally known as The BOC Group, Inc., formerly known as Airco, Inc. (identified in the Amended Complaint as Airco Welders Supply) are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/23/2014. (klb)
December 31, 2014 228 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 227 Motion to Dismiss. All of the Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant General Electric Company are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/31/2014. (nv)
January 9, 2015 234 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 229 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Gregory R. Youman for Crane Co. individually and as successor in interest to Cochrane and Chapman, Co., Chempump. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/09/2015. (klb)
January 13, 2015 236 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 235 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michael Jordan Sechler for Crane Co. - Chempump, & Crane Co. - Cochrane and Chapman Valve Co. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 1/13/15. (ejb)
January 15, 2015 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 237 Motion to Dismiss. All of Pla's claims against Dft Flowserve US, Inc. are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 01/15/2015. (klb)
February 9, 2015 255 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 254 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Clifton Trigg Hutchinson for Crane Co. - Chempump,Clifton Trigg Hutchinson for Crane Co. - Chempump,Clifton Trigg Hutchinson for Crane Co. - Cochrane and Ch apman Valve Co.,Clifton Trigg Hutchinson for Crane Co. - Cochrane and Chapman Valve Co.,Clifton Trigg Hutchinson for Crane Co. - Stockham Valve,Clifton Trigg Hutchinson for Crane Co. - Stockham Valve. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 02/09/2015. (klb)
February 9, 2015 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 239 Joint Motion to Dismiss and all of the Plaintiffs' claims against the Defendant Airgas USA, LLC are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/09/2015. (thh)
February 13, 2015 258 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 257 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Richard A. Farrier for Crane Co. - Chempump, Crane Co. - Cochrane and Chapman Valve Co., Crane Co. - Stockham Valve. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/13/15. (ejb)
March 13, 2015 270 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 269 Motion to Dismiss. All of the Plaintiffs claims against Defendant Linde LLC, a Delaware Corporation, formally known as The BOC Group, Inc., formerly known as Airco, Inc. (identified in the Amended Complaint as Airco Welders Supply) are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/13/2015. (klb)
April 8, 2015 272 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 271 Joint Motion to Dismiss Pltfs' claims against Deft Gardner Denver, Inc. without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/8/15. (ejb)
April 27, 2015 274 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, that the Plaintiffs' claims against the following defendants are DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE: Flowserve Corporation, individually and as successor to Byron Jackson Pump Company; Flowserve Corporation, individually and as successor in interest to Worcester Valve Co.; Goulds Pumps; ITT Corporation; and SFS (USA) Holding Inc., doing business as Peerless Pump Company. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 4/27/2015. (nv)
April 27, 2015 275 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 4/27/2015. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (nv)
November 12, 2013 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 62 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Matthew Culp for Airgas Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/12/2013. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hutto et al v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Lee Hutto
Represented By: William M. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Seay Hutto
Represented By: William M. Graham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation
Represented By: Frank J. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.W. Chesterton, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark-Reliance Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co. - Cochrane and Chapman Valve Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co. - Chempump
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co. - Stockham Valve
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crosby Valve, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation - Aldrich Pump Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation - Byron Jackson Pump Company
Represented By: Timothy W. Bouch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation - Worcester Valve Co.
Represented By: Mark S. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve Corporation - Pacific Pumps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flowserve US Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gardner Denver, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Monroe Sprinkle, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Timothy Peck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Charles Monroe Sprinkle, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SFS (USA) Holding Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Conveyor Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yarway Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zurn Industries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: A.W. Chesterton, Inc.
Represented By: Mark S. Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.