Asheville Downtown Holdings, LTD v. TD Bank, N.A. et al

Defendant: TD Bank, N.A. and J.W. Davis
Plaintiff: Asheville Downtown Holdings, LTD
Case Number: 1:2013cv00135
Filed: May 10, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Alexander
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint, denying without prejudice 17 Motion to Remand to State Court; denying as moot 9 & 11 Motions to Dismiss; Clerk directed to docket First Amended Complaint [# 20] as operable complaint in this case; Defts have 20 days from entry of this Order to answer or otherwise respond to Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 9/20/13. (ejb)
October 2, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Pltf shall have until 10/16/13 to file a motion to remand and supporting legal brief, Defts shall have 10 days to file a single response & Pltf shall have 7 days to file a reply brief; and the Court GRANTS 27 Motion to Stay this case pending a ruling on the motion to remand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/2/13. (ejb)
February 25, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion to Remand to Buncombe County General Court of Justice, Superior Court Division. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 02/24/2014. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Asheville Downtown Holdings, LTD v. TD Bank, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TD Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Lance P. Martin
Represented By: Norman J. Leonard, II
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.W. Davis
Represented By: Robert B. Long, Jr.
Represented By: Wyatt S. Stevens
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asheville Downtown Holdings, LTD
Represented By: David R. Payne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]