Capital Bank, N.A. v. Bright's Creek Lot 71, LLC et al

Defendant: Samuel Lancelotta and Bright's Creek Lot 71, LLC
Plaintiff: Capital Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00146
Filed: May 24, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Polk
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 28, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 13 Motion for Summary Judgment and Defendants 15 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 7/28/14. (nv)
December 3, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that within fourteen days of the entry of this Order, the parties shall pay to the Court the amount of $1,882.24 in jury costs. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 12/3/2014. (nv)
July 19, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before 08/08/2013, the Defendant Brights Creek Lot 71, LLC shall file a response disclosing the names and citizenships. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 07/18/2013. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Capital Bank, N.A. v. Bright's Creek Lot 71, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samuel Lancelotta
Represented By: Edward Louis Bleynat, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bright's Creek Lot 71, LLC
Represented By: Edward Louis Bleynat, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Capital Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Stephen McIntyre Honeycutt
Represented By: John B. Honeycutt, Jr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]