Federal Insurance Company v. Omega Flex, Inc. et al

Defendant: River Cane Builders, Inc., S. Fox Electric, LLC, McNutt Services Group, Inc., RB's Gas, Inc. and Omega Flex, Inc.
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00276
Filed: October 18, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Asheville Office
County: Buncombe
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Property Damage Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 10, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added William Duffie Powers for S. Fox Electric, LLC,William Duffie Powers for S. Fox Electric, LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/10/13. (nll)
March 6, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 22 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 03/06/14. (emw)
March 11, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 27 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/11/2014. (tmg)
April 18, 2014 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 32 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time for Service of Process. The Plaintiff is granted an additional 60 days to perfect service of process on Defendant RB's Gas, Inc. in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 04/17/2014. (thh)
April 28, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 34 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 04/28/2014. (thh)
November 12, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that this action is hereby STAYED as to Defendant McNutt Service Group, Inc. only. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 11/12/2013. (thh)
June 23, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that on or before July 14, 2014, the Defendant, S. Fox Electric, LLC, shall file a response disclosing the names and citizenships, if any, of all the constituent members or partners of S. Fox Electric, LLC and for any su ch constituent members or partners that are limited liability companies or partnerships, to identify the citizenships of the respective constituent members or partners until all such constituents are fully identified. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 6/23/14. (nv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Federal Insurance Company v. Omega Flex, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: River Cane Builders, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Fox Electric, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McNutt Services Group, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RB's Gas, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Omega Flex, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: John Waldo Reis
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]