Bader v. Sossomon

Plaintiff: Gregory Bader
Defendant: Creighton W Sossomon
Case Number: 2:2009cv00049
Filed: September 2, 2009
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Bryson City Office
County: Macon
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity - Legal Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2010 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Defendant may respond in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 56(e)(2) on or before June 18, 2010 re 14 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on June 3, 2010. (jhg)
September 8, 2010 36 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT in favor of Gregory Bader against Creighton W Sossomon. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on September 8, 2010. (jhg)
February 25, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for Final Execution and Issuance of Writ of Execution. Further ordered that the Judgment Debtor is hereby precluded from claiming that any of his property is exempt from the Judgment. Further order ed that a final execution be issued by the Clerk of this Court for the collection of the judgment in this case. Further ordered that the Deft-Judgment Debtor shall appear at the offices of Mark C. Kurdys, counsel for the Plaintiff-Judgment Creditor at Roberts & Stevens, P.A., Asheville, North Carolina for examination under oath on or before twenty (21) days from the date of this Order and, in accordance with the subpoena issued for such examination, shall bring with him to that examination all such documents and files in his possession or control describing the nature, extent and location of all property or assets in which the Defendant-Judgment Debtor held any interest on or at any time since August 21, 2007. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/25/2011. (pdf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bader v. Sossomon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Bader
Represented By: Mark Clifford Kurdys
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Creighton W Sossomon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]