United States of America v. Nederveld

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Herbert C Nederveld
 
Case Number: 2:2010cv00014
Filed: May 12, 2010
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Bryson City Office
County: Macon
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause of Action: 26:7403
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 12, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 9 Motion for an Order of Sale. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall immediately send a copy of this Order to all counsel of record; to Defendant Herbert C. Nederveld at 528 Arbour Way, Suwanee, Georg ia 30024; to Roger Sweeney, Property Appraisal and Liquidation Specialist, Internal Revenue Service, 410 Amherst Street Suite 350, Nashua, NH 03063; and to the United States Marshal. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/12/2010. (pdf)
July 6, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISTRIBUTION of Funds-ORDERED that the sale of the Subject Property on April 21, 2011, is hereby CONFIRMED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that PALS shall convey by Deed the Subject Property to Stephen M. and Elizabeth G. Spea rs, the persons described as the purchasers in the Report of Sale filed in this case and that Clerk of this Court shall distribute the funds deposited into its registry in this action as follows: a. To the United States, in care of its counsel, as re imbursement for expenses incurred in selling the Property: $2,717.68. b. To the United States, in care of its counsel, the net sales proceeds, for application against the outstanding federal income tax liabilities of Herbert C. Nederveld $ 63,282.32, plus any interest that has accrued on the sales proceeds deposited with the Court. The Clerk shall furnish copies of this Order to all counsel and unrepresented parties of record. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on July 5, 2011. (jhg)
July 8, 2010 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for Default Judgment. The tax liens of the United States are hereby foreclosed on Nedervelds interest in the property located at 441 Ruby Knoll Lane, Franklin, North Carolina 28743, as that property is more particularly described in the Complaint in this matter, and the property will be sold pursuant to a separate order of the Court. The United States shall have fourteen (14) days from the date of entry of this Judgment to submit a proposed order of sale in accordance with this Judgment.. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on July 7, 2010. (pdf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Nederveld
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Benjamin L. Tompkins
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Herbert C Nederveld
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]