J&P Dickey Real Estate Family Limited Partnership et al v. Northrop Grumman Guidance and Electronics Company, Inc. et al

Defendant: Moog Inc. and Northrop Grumman Guidance and Electronics Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: J&P Dickey Real Estate Family Limited Partnership, Jerry L. Dickey and P-Nut Dickey
 
Case Number: 2:2011cv00037
Filed: September 28, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Bryson City Office
County: Cherokee
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: Diversity - Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 12, 2011 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Frank Leone, Jr for Moog Inc., Northrop Grumman Guidance and Electronics Company, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/11/11. (nll)
October 12, 2011 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jennifer H. Gans for Moog Inc., Northrop Grumman Guidance and Electronics Company, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/11/11. (nll)
October 12, 2011 12 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Donald W. Fowler for Moog Inc., Northrop Grumman Guidance and Electronics Company, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/11/11.(nll)
October 19, 2011 18 Featured Case ORDER that on or before 11/09/2011, the pltfs and defts shall file a response disclosing the names and citizenships, if any, of all the constituent partners of J&P Dickey Real Estate Family Limited Partnership, a Georgia Limit ed Partnership, that being all of the general and limited partners of the partnership, and, for any such constituent members or partners that are limited liability companies or partnerships, to identify the citizenships of the respective constituent members or partners until all such constituents are fully identified. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/19/11. (nll)
December 19, 2011 27 Featured Case ORDER directing Plaintiffs to file a response to the motion by 12/23/11. No extension of time shall be granted. The Court further INSTRUCTS Plaintiff that the failure to file a response by 12/23/11, will result in the Court deeming all the claims asserted against Defendants abandoned and the Court will recommend to the District Court that it dismiss the claims against Defendants with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/19/11. (nll)
March 19, 2012 33 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/19/12. (nll)
May 25, 2012 38 Featured Case ORDER granting 34 Motion to Stay and 36 Motion to Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 05/25/12. (emw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: J&P Dickey Real Estate Family Limited Partnership et al v. Northrop Grumman Guidance and Electronics Company, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moog Inc.
Represented By: Donald Wayne Fowler
Represented By: Jennifer Hagan Gans
Represented By: Ann-Patton Hornthal
Represented By: Frank Leone, Jr.
Represented By: James Walker Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northrop Grumman Guidance and Electronics Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Hagan Gans
Represented By: Donald Wayne Fowler
Represented By: Ann-Patton Hornthal
Represented By: Frank Leone, Jr.
Represented By: James Walker Williams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&P Dickey Real Estate Family Limited Partnership
Represented By: Zeyland G. McKinney, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry L. Dickey
Represented By: Zeyland G. McKinney, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: P-Nut Dickey
Represented By: Zeyland G. McKinney, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]