Great Oak NC Lender, LLC v. Cornblum et al

Defendant: Longbranch Properties, LLC, Marshall E. Cornblum, Madeline H. Cornblum, Michael Cornblum and Carolyn Cornblum
Plaintiff: Asset Holding Company 5, LLC
 
Case Number: 2:2012cv00034
Filed: August 17, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Bryson City Office
County: Swain
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Negotiable Instrument
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 8, 2012 11 Featured Case ORDER that on or before November 27, 2012, the Plaintiff Asset Holding Company 5, LLC shall file a response disclosing the names and citizenships of all the constituent members or partners of Asset Holding Company 5, LLC. (SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS). Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/08/2012. (thh)
November 19, 2012 13 Featured Case ORDER directing Plaintiff and Defendant Longbranch Properties, LLC to file a response disclosing the names and citizenship of the respective members or partners of their limited liability companies re 11 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/17/2012. (thh)
August 12, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL without prejudice; denying as moot 30 Motion to Intervene, 15 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, 16 Motion to Consolidate Cases, and 22 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Answer. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 8/12/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(nll)
October 31, 2013 48 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER granting 41 Motion to Alter or Amend Judgment; and vacating in part 39 Order of Dismissal entered 8/12/2013, with respect to denial of Great Oak's Motion to Intervene as moot. In all other respects, Order of Dismissal remains undisturbed. FURTHER ORDERED 30 Motion to Intervene is GRANTED and Great Oak NC Lender LLC shall file its Intervenor Complaint within 30 days of entry of this Order. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 10/31/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb) NEF Regenerated to US Court of Appeals on 10/31/2013 (ejb).
February 19, 2014 60 Featured Case ORDER re 58 Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan, 59 Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan, ( Status Hearing/Conference set for 3/3/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2, 10 0 Otis St, Asheville, NC 28801 before Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell.) Counsel for Plaintiff and counsel for Defendants are required to appear for hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 2/19/14. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(ejb)
March 6, 2014 66 Featured Case ORDER to Disclose Citizenship of Constituent Members, to be filed on or before 3/19/14. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 3/5/2014. (khm)
May 28, 2014 74 Featured Case ORDER that the 66 Order to Disclose Citizenship is hereby RESCINDED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 5/28/14. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Great Oak NC Lender, LLC v. Cornblum et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longbranch Properties, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall E. Cornblum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madeline H. Cornblum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Cornblum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Cornblum
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Asset Holding Company 5, LLC
Represented By: Esther Elizabeth Manheimer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]