Adams v. Colvin

Plaintiff: Sharon Radford Adams
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
 
Case Number: 2:2013cv00019
Filed: April 23, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Bryson City Office
County: Graham
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
December 12, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Added Howard David Olinsky for Sharon Radford Adams. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 12/12/13. (emw)
May 1, 2014 24 Featured Case ORDER accepting and adopting 14 Memorandum and Recommendations; denying Pltf's 10 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting Deft's 12 Motion for Summary Judgment, and affirming the Commissioner's decision. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/1/14. (ejb)
May 1, 2014 25 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 5/1/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (ejb)
May 22, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Karen S. Southwick for Sharon Radford Adams. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 5/22/13. (ejb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Adams v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Radford Adams
Represented By: Russell R. Bowling
Represented By: Karen S. Southwick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]