Synovus Bank v. Browner

Defendant: Marc J. Browner
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Case Number: 2:2013cv00025
Filed: June 7, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Bryson City Office
County: Jackson
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 29, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added T. William McGee, III for Synovus Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 8/29/13. (nll)
November 25, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Tara Cloer Sullivan for Synovus Bank. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/25/13. (nll)
January 16, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan [Doc. 9] is hereby AMENDED, and Bench Trial RESET for 11/10/2014 09:01 AM in Courtroom 1, 100 Otis St., ASHEVILLE, NC 28801 before District Judge Martin Reidinger. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 1/15/2014. (khm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Synovus Bank v. Browner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc J. Browner
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Synovus Bank
Represented By: Steven Brent McFarland
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]