United States of America v. Phipps

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: James V. Phipps
 
Case Number: 3:2008cv00432
Filed: September 18, 2008
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Contract: Recovery Student Loan Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: Carl Horn
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
 
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 20:1080 Student Loan Recovery

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2009 15 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT in favor of Plaintiff against James V. Phipps. Signed by the Clerk on 2/11/09. (siw) (Default Judgment filed on request from Judge Reidinger's Chambers.)
March 7, 2011 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Writ of Garnishment, Writ issued. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 3/6/11. (bsw)
April 29, 2011 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion to Dismiss Writ of Continuing Garnishment as to Blevins Workshop, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 4/29/2011. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: United States of America v. Phipps
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Youngs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James V. Phipps
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]