Olsen v. Ipex, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Thomas Olsen
Defendant: Ipex, Inc. and Ipex USA, LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2008cv00480
Filed: October 20, 2008
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Contract Product Liability Office
County: Alexander
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: Carl Horn
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 23, 2008 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting {5} Motion for leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, granting {6} Motion for leave to appear Pro Hac Vice, granting {7} Motion for leave to appear Pro Hac Vice. (dtr) Modified on 10/24/2008 to add text(dtr).
February 3, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Russell Lewis for Ipex, Inc. and Ipex USA, LLC, granting 14 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Richard L. Josephson for Ipex, Inc. and Ipex USA, LLC,. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/3/09. (dtr)
February 5, 2009 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, ( Initial Pretrial Conference set for 3/10/2009 02:30 PM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Carl Horn III.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl Horn, III on 2/5/09. (dtr)
February 9, 2009 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 18 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michael Andrew McShane for Thomas Olsen. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/6/09. (dtr)
February 11, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Brendan Thompson for Thomas Olsen. Signed by District Judge Martin Reidinger on 2/11/09. (dtr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Olsen v. Ipex, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Olsen
Represented By: John Scott Austin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ipex, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ipex USA, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]