Zep Inc. v. Midwest Motor Supply Co. et al

Plaintiff: Zep Inc.
Defendant: Midwest Motor Supply Co. and John Thomas Belk
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv00005
Filed: January 8, 2009
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Personal Property: Other Office
County: XX, Outside State
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Diversity
Jury Demanded By: 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 8, 2009 33 Featured Case ORDER granting 28 Motion to Change Venue and the case of Zep, Inc. v. Midwest Motor Supply Co. d/b/a Kimball Midwest and John Thomas Belk is RE-SEVERED and transferred to the Charlotte Division of the Western District of North Carolina with asepar ate docket number; the case of Zep, Inc. v. Midwest Motor Supply Co. d/b/a Kimball Midwest, Steven Lave, and Samuel Trantham is RETAINED in theAsheville Division of this court and shall proceed under docket number 1:08cv550;. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 01/07/09. (emw) [Transferred from North Carolina Western on 1/8/2009.]
January 29, 2009 43 Featured Case ORDER granting 41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added David E. Gevertz for Zep Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/29/2009. (klg)
January 29, 2009 44 Featured Case ORDER granting 42 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Megan K. Ouzts for Zep Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/29/2009. (klg)
February 10, 2009 48 Featured Case Stipulated PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/9/2009. (klg)
March 11, 2009 54 Featured Case ORDER Consolidating Cases for Trial. All further pleadings to be docketed to: 1:08cv550. Member Case: 3:09cv5 to be administratively closed. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 03/10/2009. (thh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Zep Inc. v. Midwest Motor Supply Co. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zep Inc.
Represented By: James D. Kurek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midwest Motor Supply Co.
Represented By: Willis Irl Reasoner, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Thomas Belk
Represented By: Grant B. Osborne
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]