United States of America v. $16,260.00 in United States Currency

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: $16,260.00 in United States Currency
Case Number: 3:2009cv00023
Filed: January 16, 2009
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Drug Related Seizure of Property Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Martin Reidinger
Nature of Suit: None
Cause of Action: U.S. Government Plaintiff
Jury Demanded By: 21:0881 Property Forfeiture

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 18, 2009 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Govt to submit proposed order of forfeiture on defendant property. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 12/18/2009. (bsw)
December 21, 2009 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 12/21/09. (com)
January 21, 2009 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and Warrant for arrest in rem re 1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 1/21/09. (dtr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. $16,260.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: William A. Brafford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: $16,260.00 in United States Currency
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]