Couick v. Wyeth, Incorporated et al

Plaintiff: Mary Cleo Couick
Defendant: Wyeth, Incorporated, Activus, Inc, Actavis Elizbeth LLC, Schwarz Pharma, Inc and Pliva USA, Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2009cv00210
Filed: May 28, 2009
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Union
0 Judge:
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
 
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
October 7, 2009 33 Featured Case ORDER granting 29 , 30 , 31 , 32 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Tiffany Reece, Rex A. Littrell, Joseph P. Thomas, Linda E. Maichl for Pliva USA, Inc;. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/7/2009. (tmg)
November 24, 2009 39 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND RECOMMENDATIONS recommending denying 35 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Based Upon Federal Preemption filed by Pliva USA, Inc. Objections to M&R due by 12/14/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/24/2009. (tmg)
December 7, 2009 42 Featured Case ORDER adopting in part 39 Memorandum and Recommendations ; denying 12 Motion to Dismiss; denying 35 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 12/7/2009. (tmg)
January 7, 2010 51 Featured Case ORDER granting 49 and 50 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Hugh M. Stanley and Richard A. Dean for Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Activus, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/7/2010. (tmg)
February 18, 2010 59 Featured Case ORDER granting 56 , 57 , 58 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Jeffrey R. Pilkington for Wyeth, Incorporated; added Henninger S. Bullock and Andrew J. Calica for Schwarz Pharma, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/18/2010. (tmg)
March 8, 2010 60 Featured Case ORDER granting 44 Motion for Summary Judgment, all claims against Wyeth, Incorporated and Schwarz Pharma, Inc are hereby dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/8/2010. (tmg)
May 6, 2010 64 Featured Case ORDER granting 62 Motion for Entry of Judgment, and the Court's March 8, 2010 60 Order is certified as final. The Clerk is directed to enter final judgment in favor of Defendants Wyeth,Inc. and Schwarz Pharma, Inc. only, pursuant to FRCP 54(b). Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 5/6/10. (chh)
May 6, 2010 65 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in favor or Defendants Wyeth, Inc. and Schwarz Pharma, Inc. only in accordance with the Court's Order dated 5/6/10. (chh)
October 25, 2010 69 Featured Case ORDER granting 66 , 67 and 68 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Daniel J. McGlynn, William B. Curtis, Terrence J. Donahue, Jr for Mary Cleo Couick. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 10/24/2010. (tmg)
January 25, 2011 76 Featured Case ORDER granting 70 Motion to Stay pending the US Supreme Courts resolution of theMensing and Demahy cases, upon resolution the parties shall file a motion for Status Conference with proposed new deadlines; and the Clerk is directed to correct the party name from Activus, Inc. to Actavis, Inc.. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 1/25/2011. (tmg)
January 11, 2012 97 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 77 Joint Motion to Dismiss; adopting in part 81 Memorandum and Recommendations. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 1/11/2012. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Couick v. Wyeth, Incorporated et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Cleo Couick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wyeth, Incorporated
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Activus, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizbeth LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schwarz Pharma, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pliva USA, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]