Floyd v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service

Plaintiff: Billy D. Floyd
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service
Case Number: 3:2010cv00066
Filed: February 22, 2010
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Union
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1651 Petition for Writ of Mandamus
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2010 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 4 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/13/2010. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
July 14, 2010 12 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated July 14, 2010. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
October 5, 2010 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Request for Injunction contained in 13 Notice of Appeal. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/5/2010. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
June 14, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 4 MOTION to Dismiss.(Responses due by 6/28/2010.). Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 6/14/2010. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Floyd v. Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy D. Floyd
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Internal Revenue Service
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]