Ospina v. Tadlock

Appellant: Mariano Hernando Ospina
Appellee: Warren L. Tadlock
Case Number: 3:2010cv00485
Filed: September 30, 2010
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Appeal
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 28, 2010 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, denying 9 MOTION of Appeal,( Show Cause Response as to why the appeal should not be dismissed due by 1/10/2011). Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 12/28/2010. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail, cert mail, return recpt requested.)(bsw)
March 28, 2011 14 Opinion or Order of the Court Order Dismissing Appellant's Motion to Appeal. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/28/11. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail - Certified 70081830000143768554.)(com)
March 29, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated March 28, 2011. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(com)
November 3, 2010 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER- Plaintiff is advised to submit payment of the $255.00 filing fee to the US Bankruptcy Court within 10 days. Plaintiff is advised to file a designation of items to be included in the record on appeal and a statement of the issues to be presented to the US District Court within ten days. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 11/2/10. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail, return receipt #7003 1010 0003 5291 2723.)(gpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ospina v. Tadlock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Mariano Hernando Ospina
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Warren L. Tadlock
Represented By: Warren Lee Tadlock
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]