Securities and Exchange Commission

Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: William K. Harrison and Eddie W. Sawyers
Case Number: 3:2010cv00634
Filed: December 15, 2010
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Alexander
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 12:22
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 14, 2011 11 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL CONSENT JUDGMENT as to Eddie W. Sawyers. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/14/2011. (tmg)
July 24, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL CONSENT JUDGMENT as to William K. Harrison. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/24/2012. (tmg)
April 15, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL CONSENT JUDGMENT as to William K. Harrison. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/15/2011. (tmg)
April 15, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court PARTIAL CONSENT JUDGMENT as to Eddie W. Sawyers. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/15/2011. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Kristin Beth Wilhelm
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William K. Harrison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie W. Sawyers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]