Saidiani v. NextCare, Inc et al

Defendant: John Shufeldt
Plaintiff: Antonio Saidiani
Case Number: 3:2011cv00141
Filed: March 24, 2011
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion to Unseal Case. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/21/2012. (eef)
July 18, 2012 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion to unseal in part. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/16/2012. (bsw)
July 25, 2012 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added William H Jordan for Colorado Urgent Care, LLC, Matrix Occupational Health, Inc, NextCare Arizona LLC, NextCare Georgia LLC, NextCare North Carolina LLC, NextCare Texas LLC, NextCare, Inc, Virginia Urgent Care, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/25/2012. (eef)
February 4, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 30 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/4/2013. (eef)
May 6, 2013 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 46 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 5/6/2013. (eef)
June 13, 2013 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Daniel R. Miller for Antonio Saidiani. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/13/2013. (eef)
June 13, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 60 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Yael R. May for Antonio Saidiani. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/13/2013. (eef)
June 13, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/12/2014. (eef)
July 30, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 80 MOTION for stay of discovery. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 07/30/2014. (jlk)
August 28, 2014 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER before the Court on its own motion, ( Jury Trial re-set for 2/9/2015 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/28/2014. (eef)
September 18, 2014 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting with prejudice as to Relator Saidiani 80 Motion to Dismiss; FURTHER ORDERED that this case will be held open as to the United States for a period of 60 days in order for the United States to make a determination as to what steps it will take with respect to this litigation. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 9/18/2014. (eef)
December 16, 2014 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/16/2014. (eef)
December 16, 2014 92 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 12/16/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Saidiani v. NextCare, Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Shufeldt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Saidiani
Represented By: Clifford C. Marshall, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]