Catalano et al v. Tricam Industries, Inc. et al

Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc. and Tricam Industries, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kim Patrick Catalano and Sallie Catalano
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00282
Filed: June 10, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 27, 2011 10 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/27/2011. (tmg)
May 8, 2012 15 Featured Case ORDER, ( Jury Trial set for 11/5/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 05/08/2012. (blf)
October 3, 2012 26 Featured Case ORDER, ( Jury Trial re-set for 2/11/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). The Court anticipates setting a hearing on the pending motions. A date for such hearing will be scheduled at a later time. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/3/2012. (eef)
October 5, 2012 27 Featured Case ORDER, ( Jury Trial reset for 4/8/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Senior Judge Graham Mullen.). The Court anticipates setting a hearing on the pending motions. A date for such hearing will be scheduled at a later time. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/5/2012. (blf)
January 7, 2013 28 Featured Case ORDER granting 17 Motion for Summary Judgment ; granting 18 Motion in Limine; granting 19 Motion in Limine. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 1/4/2013. (blf)
January 7, 2013 29 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 1/4/2013. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (blf)
June 15, 2011 5 Featured Case ORDER granting 4 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Paul V. Kaulas for Home Depot U.S.A., Inc., Paul V. Kaulas for Tricam Industries, Inc. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 6/15/2011. (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Catalano et al v. Tricam Industries, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Home Depot U.S.A., Inc.
Represented By: Charles Jonathan Bridgmon
Represented By: John Thomas Holden
Represented By: Paul V. Kaulas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tricam Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Charles Jonathan Bridgmon
Represented By: John Thomas Holden
Represented By: Paul V. Kaulas
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Patrick Catalano
Represented By: Jerome P. Trehy, Jr.
Represented By: Charles G. Monnett, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sallie Catalano
Represented By: Jerome P. Trehy, Jr.
Represented By: Charles G. Monnett, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]