Wix Filtration Corp LLC v. Purolator Filters NA LLC

Plaintiff: Wix Filtration Corp LLC
Defendant: Purolator Filters NA LLC
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00289
Filed: June 13, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Gaston
Referring Judge: Dennis Howell
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Michael R. Levinson for Wix Filtration Corp LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/30/2011. (tmg)
December 1, 2011 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Daniel J. Schwartz for Wix Filtration Corp LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/30/2011. (tmg)
December 13, 2011 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 14 Motion to Stay Initial Attorney Conference until 1/20/2012. Certificate of IAC due 1/27/2012. Wix Filtration Corp LLC answer to 6 Counterclaim due 1/6/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 12/12/2011. (tmg)
November 18, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, added Michael H. Jacobs for Purolator Filters NA LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 11/18/11. (gpb)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Wix Filtration Corp LLC v. Purolator Filters NA LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wix Filtration Corp LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Keister
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purolator Filters NA LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]