United States of Amercia v. Tibbs

Plaintiff: United States of Amercia
Defendant: Nathan A. Tibbs
Case Number: 3:2011cv00416
Filed: August 30, 2011
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Recovery of Defaulted Student Loans (Excl. Veterans)
Cause of Action: 20:1080
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 5 Motion for Entry of Default. Signed on 10/24/11. (chh)
February 14, 2012 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Withdraw Default Judgment and to Hold Case in Abeyance During Pendency of Bankruptcy Proceedings. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/14/2012. (tmg) (Main Document 12 replaced on 2/14/2012) (tmg).
July 24, 2014 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Government shall advise the Court as to the status of the bankruptcy proceedings and their impact, if any, on the status of the instant case within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 07/24/2014. (jlk)
October 25, 2011 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for Entry of Judgment. Signed by Frank G. Johns on 10/25/11. (chh)
October 25, 2011 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Bill of Costs. Signed by Frank G. Johns on 10/25/11. (chh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of Amercia v. Tibbs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of Amercia
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Youngs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan A. Tibbs
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]