Adolphe v. Option One Mortgage Corporation et al

Defendant: LPS, Jeff A. Bunda, Elizabeth B. Ells, Shapiro and Ingle, LLP, Option One Mortgage Corporation, Jeffery A. Bunda, David Applegate, American Home Mortgage Service, Inc, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., John Stumpf, First American title Insurance Company, Dennis Gilmore, Chicago Title Insurance Company, Lee Kennedy, Joseph C. Patterson, Carolina Realty, Moss Codilis, LLP, Katherine Begor, Geoffrey C. Hemenway, Does and David W. Neill
Plaintiff: Robyn Adolphe
 
Case Number: 3:2011cv00418
Filed: September 1, 2011
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2012 120 Featured Case ORDER granting 68 Motion to Strike 63 Notice of Interest. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 8/6/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(com)
September 4, 2012 128 Featured Case ORDER re: 124 Response and Motion for Judicial Assistance. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (doc no. 123) is hereby stricken. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/4/12. (Pro se litigant to be served by US Mail on 9/7/12.)(com)
November 20, 2012 132 Featured Case ORDER granting 96 Motion to Dismiss; granting 105 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 105 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; granting 109 Motion to Dismiss; granting 111 Motion to D ismiss; granting 113 Motion to Dismiss; granting 115 Motion to Dismiss; denying 129 Motion for Reconsideration ; dismissing 72 amended complaint. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 11/20/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
November 20, 2012 133 Featured Case CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 11/20/2012. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
October 13, 2011 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 , 9 , 10 , and 11 MOTIONS for Extension of Time to Answer. Katherine Begor answer due 11/12/2011; Jeff A. Bunda answer due 11/12/2011; Jeffery A. Bunda answer due 11/12/2011; Chicago Title Insurance C ompany answer due 11/12/2011; Elizabeth B. Ells answer due 11/12/2011; First American title Insurance Company answer due 11/12/2011; Dennis Gilmore answer due 11/12/2011; David W. Neill answer due 11/12/2011; Shapiro and Ingle, LLP answer due 11/12/2011; John Stumpf answer due 11/12/2011; Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. answer due 11/12/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis Howell on 10/13/2011. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)
July 3, 2012 94 Featured Case ORDER denying 24 Ex Parte Motion; denying 39 Motion for Hearing; denying 83 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 92 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 7/3/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(com)
July 3, 2012 95 Featured Case ORDER dismissing as moot 12 16 18 36 45 48 Motions to Dismiss; dismissing as moot 52 Motion to Amend/Correct; dismissing as moot 57 Motion for Leave to File; dismissing as moot 58 Motion to Strike; gra nting 72 Motion to file Amended Complaint; dismsinng as moot 82 Motion for Extension of Time; granting, nunc pro tunc 89 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 7/3/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Adolphe v. Option One Mortgage Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LPS
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeff A. Bunda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth B. Ells
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shapiro and Ingle, LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Option One Mortgage Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery A. Bunda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Applegate
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Home Mortgage Service, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Stumpf
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First American title Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Gilmore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chicago Title Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lee Kennedy
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joseph C. Patterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolina Realty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moss Codilis, LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Begor
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Geoffrey C. Hemenway
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David W. Neill
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robyn Adolphe
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]