US Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Prestige Capital Advisors, LLC et al

Plaintiff: US Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Prestige Capital Advisors, LLC, D2W Capital Management, LLC and Toby D. Hunter
Claimant: Taylored Business Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2011cv00431
Filed: September 6, 2011
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 7:6
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 20, 2011 10 Opinion or Order of the Court CONSENT ORDER of Preliminary Injunction and for other equitable relief against defendant Toby D. Hunter. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/20/11. (chh)
September 22, 2011 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 11 Motion to Prosecute Pending State Court Action. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/22/11. (gpb)
September 24, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 20 Scheduling Order, ( Bench Trial set for 2/4/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr..). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 9/24/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
October 1, 2012 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 25 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Docket Call/Trial and Pre-Trial Deadlines, ( Discovery due by 2/4/2013., Motions due by 3/4/2013., Mediation deadline set for 3/4/2013., Bench Trial set for 6/3/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before District Judge Max O. Cogburn Jr..). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 10/1/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
January 25, 2013 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 30 Motion to Intervene; granting 32 Motion to Intervene & to Stay; granting 27 Motion for Default Judgment as to Prestige Capital Advisors and D2W Capital Mgmt ; denying without prejudice 28 Motion for Extension of Time to file response/reply. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 1/25/13. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(bsw)
February 22, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 35 Motion for Reconsideration re 34 Order on Motion to Intervene, Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Default Judgment, Order on Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 2/22/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: US Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Prestige Capital Advisors, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: US Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: Eugenia Vroustouris
Represented By: Daniel Church Jordan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prestige Capital Advisors, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D2W Capital Management, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Toby D. Hunter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Taylored Business Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Martin L. Brackett, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]