Boyter et al v. Bank of America Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Dirk E. Berghmans and Dianne B. Boyter
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation, Bank of America Home Loans Servicing LP and John & Jane Does
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00189
Filed: March 26, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
 
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 12:191
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 21, 2012 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 14 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 8/21/12. (bsw)
November 20, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; affirming 28 Memorandum and Recommendations.. Signed by Chief Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 11/20/2012. (tmg)
November 20, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated November 20, 2012. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (tmg)
May 22, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion to Vacate 5 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/22/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Boyter et al v. Bank of America Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dirk E. Berghmans
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dianne B. Boyter
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: J. Scott Flowers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Home Loans Servicing LP
Represented By: J. Scott Flowers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Does
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]