Southern Concrete Products, Inc. v. The Euclid Chemical Company et al

Plaintiff: Southern Concrete Products, Inc.
Defendant: The Euclid Chemical Company and Giant Cement Company
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00257
Filed: April 25, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
 
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2013 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Motion to Dismiss With Prejudice Defendant Giant Cement Company. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 2/13/2013. (tmg)
February 20, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/19/2013. (eef)
March 1, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 24 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 2/28/2013. (tmg)
March 5, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 43 Motion to Postpone Discovery And Mediation Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 3/4/2013. (eef)
May 3, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 47 Motion to Compel; denying as moot 49 Motion to Compel; denying as moot 53 . parties shall file a Stipulation of Dismissal, or in the alternative request an extension of time to file such dismissal, on or before May 15, 2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 5/2/2013. (eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Southern Concrete Products, Inc. v. The Euclid Chemical Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Concrete Products, Inc.
Represented By: Lex M. Erwin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Euclid Chemical Company
Represented By: Jason Benjamin Buckland
Represented By: J. Alexander S. Barrett
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giant Cement Company
Represented By: John Wood Francisco
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]