Cooksey v. Futrell et al

Plaintiff: Steve Cooksey
Defendant: Michelle Futrell, Brenda Burgin Ross, Kathleen Sodoma, Christie Nicholson, Phyllis Hilliard, Cathleen E. Ostrowski and Richard W. Holden, Sr.
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00336
Filed: May 29, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Gaston
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
 
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
August 8, 2012 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 8/7/12. (com)
October 5, 2012 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming 24 Memorandum and Recommendations. granting 19 Motion to Dismiss. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 10/5/2012. (tmg)
October 5, 2012 31 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated October 5, 2012. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (tmg)
May 30, 2012 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Jeff Rowes,Paul M. Sherman for Steve Cooksey. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 5/30/2012. (blf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Cooksey v. Futrell et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steve Cooksey
Represented By: Paul M. Sherman
Represented By: Robert W. Shaw
Represented By: Jeff Rowes
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Futrell
Represented By: Lori P. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenda Burgin Ross
Represented By: Lori P. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Sodoma
Represented By: Lori P. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christie Nicholson
Represented By: Lori P. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phyllis Hilliard
Represented By: Lori P. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathleen E. Ostrowski
Represented By: Lori P. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard W. Holden, Sr.
Represented By: Lori P. Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]