USA v. Real Property Located at 620 West Franklin Street, Salisbury, NC

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: 620 West Franklin Street, Salisbury, NC
Case Number: 3:2012cv00371
Filed: June 14, 2012
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: 21:881
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 16, 2014 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 10 Motion to Strike 6 Claim - forfeiture property by Yuritzl Maldonado Alejandre. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 5/16/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
June 19, 2014 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 6/19/2014. (tmg)
December 3, 2012 7 Opinion or Order of the Court WRIT OF ENTRY AND ORDER re 1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 12/3/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. Real Property Located at 620 West Franklin Street, Salisbury, NC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: William A. Brafford
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 620 West Franklin Street, Salisbury, NC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]