Center Capital Corporation v. Apex Homes, Inc. et al

Defendant: Leonard R. Watts and Apex Homes, Inc.
Plaintiff: Center Capital Corporation
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00404
Filed: June 29, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
 
Nature of Suit: Negotiable Instrument
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for claim and delivery of property. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/2/2012. (blf)
July 11, 2012 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Howard K. Levine for Center Capital Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/11/12. (bsw)
July 20, 2012 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The court will receive evidence, take testimony and hear arguments on Motions 2 and 5 at the 8/6/12 hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/19/12. (com)
August 7, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER continuing 8/6/12 hearing on Motion for claim and delivery until such time as set by the court; directing parties file status report on status of motion and need for hearing: ( Status Report due by 9/5/2012). Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 8/7/12. (bsw)
September 11, 2012 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 2 Motion for Claim and Delivery of property. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/11/2012. (blf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Center Capital Corporation v. Apex Homes, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonard R. Watts
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Long
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apex Homes, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Long
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center Capital Corporation
Represented By: Howard K. Levine
Represented By: Kenneth Todd Lautenschlager
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]