Latimer et al v. US Social Security Administration et al

Defendant: US Social Security Administration, Easter Seals and NC Department of Social Services
Plaintiff: Calvin Latimer and Sandra Latimer
Case Number: 3:2012cv00406
Filed: July 2, 2012
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 12, 2015 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 10 Motion for Disposition of Children. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 05/12/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(jlk)
July 5, 2012 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to respond due 7/25/2012. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 7/5/2012. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
August 16, 2012 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER affirming 7 Memorandum and Recommendations;granting 2 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction - complaint dismissed as to Defendant US Social Security Admin., remainder of action remanded to state court for disposition. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 8/16/12. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(bsw)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Latimer et al v. US Social Security Administration et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: US Social Security Administration
Represented By: Sidney P. Alexander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easter Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NC Department of Social Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Latimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Latimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.