Rubbermaid Incorporated et al v. Ergotron Inc

Plaintiff: Rubbermaid Incorporated
Defendant: Ergotron, Inc
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00416
Filed: July 10, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
 
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
September 13, 2012 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kurt John Niederluecke,Grant D. Fairbairn for Ergotron, Inc,Kurt John Niederluecke,Grant D. Fairbairn for Ergotron, Inc; granting 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Kurt John Niederluecke,Grant D. Fairbairn for Ergotron, Inc,Kurt John Niederluecke,Grant D. Fairbairn for Ergotron, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/13/2012. (blf)
September 21, 2012 18 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added David E. Finkelson,Derek H. Swanson for Rubbermaid Incorporated,David E. Finkelson,Derek H. Swanson for Rubbermaid Incorporated; granting 17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added David E. Finkelson,Derek H. Swanson for Rubbermaid Incorporated,David E. Finkelson,Derek H. Swanson for Rubbermaid Incorporated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 9/21/2012. (blf)
November 26, 2012 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Laura L. Myers for Ergotron, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/26/12. (bsw)
February 11, 2013 31 Featured Case ORDER granting 30 Motion for ESI order. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 2/8/2013. (blf)
June 4, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER granting 38 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Andriana Shultz Daly for Rubbermaid Incorporated. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 6/3/2013. (blf)
March 11, 2014 42 Featured Case MEMORANDUM OF DECISION AND ORDER re 37 Patent Claim Construction Brief, 36 Memorandum, 40 Memorandum, 34 Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement, 35 Patent Claim Construction Brief. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/11/2014. (eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rubbermaid Incorporated et al v. Ergotron Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rubbermaid Incorporated
Represented By: Robert Ashley Muckenfuss
Represented By: Matt Pearson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ergotron, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]