Daniels v. Gerdau Ameristeel, Corp.

Defendant: Gerdau Ameristeel, Corp.
Plaintiff: Ronald Daniels
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00833
Filed: December 14, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:451 Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 23, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 consent Motion to modify pretrial order as to expert witness report deadlines. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 7/22/2013. (blf)
August 27, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 19 Motion to Amend Pretrial Order and Case Management Plan. Discovery due 11/1/2013. Motions due 12/2/2013. Mediation due 11/1/2013. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 8/26/2013. (eef)
October 3, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 21 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Nicholas Dennis George for Ronald Daniels. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 10/3/2013. (tmg)
November 12, 2013 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 24 Letter requesting a judicial settlement conference pursuant to Local Rule 16.3(D)(1) before a judicial officer; Further Ordered that all proceedings in this matter are stayed pending the result of that conference. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/12/2013. (eef)
November 21, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ( Settlement Conference set for 12/12/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Magistrate Judge David Keesler.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 11/21/2013. (eef)
January 2, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Justin Lee Swidler for Ronald Daniels. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 12/28/2012. (eef)
February 4, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Gavin Stone Appleby for Gerdau Ameristeel, Corp.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/4/2013. (eef) (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/5/2013) (eef). (Main Document 8 replaced on 2/5/2013) (eef).
February 4, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Emily D. Blaiss for Gerdau Ameristeel, Corp.. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/4/2013. (eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Daniels v. Gerdau Ameristeel, Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gerdau Ameristeel, Corp.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Daniels
Represented By: Christian Emerson Dysart
Represented By: Justin Swidler
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]