McCarthy et al v. Taser International, Inc. et al

Defendant: City of Charlotte, Michael Forbes, Taser International, Inc. and Rodney Monroe
Plaintiff: Victor Williams and Temako McCarthy
 
Case Number: 3:2012cv00838
Filed: December 18, 2012
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 18, 2014 116 Featured Case ORDER that defendants motions for summary judgment re 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment , 54 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Dewitt F. McCarleys Motion to Quash Motion re 105 are scheduled for such further proceedings as herein provided at calendar call. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 6/18/2014. (eef)
July 18, 2014 127 Featured Case ORDER granting 50 Motion for Summary Judgment and the City of Charlotte is dismissed as a party to this action; granting in part and denying in part 54 Motion for Summary Judgment. This matter is set for trial during the August 2014 trial term. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 7/18/2014. (tmg)
January 24, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER granting 15 16 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added Michael A. Brave,Isaiah Fields for Taser International, Inc.; granting. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 1/24/2013. (blf)
September 24, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER granting as to Defendant Monroe, denying as to city of Charlotte 22 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; granting as to defendant Monroe, denying as to City of Charlotte 22 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; affirming 28 Memorandum and Recommendations.. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/24/2013. (blf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McCarthy et al v. Taser International, Inc. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Charlotte
Represented By: Daniel Edward Peterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Forbes
Represented By: Lori R Keeton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taser International, Inc.
Represented By: Scott Douglas MacLatchie
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Monroe
Represented By: Daniel Edward Peterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Williams
Represented By: Charles A. Everage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Temako McCarthy
Represented By: Charles A. Everage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]