Danielson v. Human et al

Defendant: John Does 1-100, H-Power Americas, Inc., H-Power Worldwide, LLC, H-Power Energy Storage Technologies, Inc., Jan Petrus Human and Albertus Johannes Humjan
Plaintiff: Aaron Keven Danielson
Case Number: 3:2012cv00840
Filed: December 14, 2012
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Alexander
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 21, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 15 MOTION for Default Judgment. The Answer filed on June 7, 2013 (Doc. No. 7) is STRICKEN. The Case Management Order filed on August 14, 2013 (Doc. No. 12) is STAYED. The Corporate Defendants have thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to retain counsel.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/21/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
February 26, 2014 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 26 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 2/26/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(blf)
April 3, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for plaintiff, if he so chooses may submit further evidence of damages to this Court no later than April 16, 2014 re 19 MOTION for Default Judgment. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 4/2/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
May 2, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 19 Motion for Default Judgment.. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/2/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
May 2, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated May 2, 2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.) (tmg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Danielson v. Human et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-100
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H-Power Americas, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H-Power Worldwide, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H-Power Energy Storage Technologies, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jan Petrus Human
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertus Johannes Humjan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Keven Danielson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]