Medical Facets NC LLC v. Medical Facets, LLC

Defendant: Medical Facets, LLC
Plaintiff: Medical Facets NC LLC
Case Number: 3:2013cv00009
Filed: January 7, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Gaston
Presiding Judge: Graham Mullen
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 21, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 18 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 11/21/2013. (eef)
August 8, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting (60) Motion to Consolidate Cases All further pleadings to be electronically filed to: 3:13-cv-00009 only. Member Case: 3:14-cv-00422 to be administratively closed in case 3:13-cv-00009-GCM. Court also directed the parties to participate in a judicial settlement conference with Magistrate Judge David Keesler. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 08/08/2014. (jlk)
August 26, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for the scheduling of a Judicial Settlement Conference (Settlement Conference set for 9/24/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3, 401 W Trade St, Charlotte, NC 28202 before Magistrate Judge David Keesler.). Signed by Magistrate Judge David Keesler on 8/25/2014. (tmg)
February 22, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice added James J. Corbett for Medical Facets, LLC. Signed by Senior Judge Graham Mullen on 2/22/2013. (eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medical Facets NC LLC v. Medical Facets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medical Facets, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medical Facets NC LLC
Represented By: William O.L. Hutchinson
Represented By: Brian Patrick Troutman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.