Malone v. Tamko Building Products Inc et al

Defendant: Tamko Roofing Products Inc and Tamko Building Products Inc
Plaintiff: Eric Malone
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00089
Filed: February 13, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Union
Referring Judge: David Keesler
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
 
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
October 8, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 13 Motion to Dismiss as to certain claims ; granting 18 Motion to Strike 17 Surreply; Defendants shall file their answer to the remaining claims on or before 10/22/2013. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 10/8/2013. (eef)
March 3, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 30 Motion to Join Necessary Party, and Dawn Christine Malone is joined as a necessary party-plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 3/3/2014. (eef)
May 22, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION granting 31 Motion for Summary Judgment. Summary judgment is granted in favor of defendants and against plaintiffs dismissing plaintiffs' breach of warranty claim with prejudice. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 5/21/2014. (eef)
May 22, 2014 45 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 5/21/2014. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Malone v. Tamko Building Products Inc et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamko Roofing Products Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tamko Building Products Inc
Represented By: Richard Horace Conner, III
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Malone
Represented By: William Woodward Webb, Sr
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]