Pendergrass v. NC Department of Public Safety et al

Plaintiff: Guy T. Pendergrass
Defendant: NC Department of Public Safety, FNU Medlin, FNU Tarrantina, FNU Cranford, FNU Rizaldi, FNU Rushing, FNU Bradley, FNU Shope, FNU Martinez and Sami Hassan
Case Number: 3:2013cv00129
Filed: February 26, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Anson
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Conrad
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2014 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 8 Motion to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint ; denying 9 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 12 Motion for Entry of Default; denying 14 Motion for Default Judgment; denying 15 Motion for Discovery; Fu rther Ordered that within twenty (20) days of entry of this order, Defendant Bradley shall either file an Answer or responsive pleading; FURTHER ORDERED that The U.S. Marshal shall attempt to re-serve Defendant Rushing in accordance with Rule 4 of th e Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; FURTHER ORDERED that the North Carolina Attorney General shall notify the Court within thirty (30) days whether it intends to investigate the allegations in the Complaint and/or file an Answer or responsive pleading on behalf of any of the named Defendants. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 3/12/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
September 9, 2014 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 23 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; granting 30 Motion to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint; denying 31 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 9/9/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
November 24, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Motion for Judicial Order. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 11/24/2014. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
May 19, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 41 Motion ; granting 42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying 56 Motion for Order to Show Cause. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 5/19/2015. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(chh)
May 19, 2015 59 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 5/19/2015. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(chh)
August 19, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that defendants Hassan, Martinez, Shope, and Tarrantina are dismissed from the Complaint. Plaintiff is required to provide the necessary information for the U.S. Marshal to effectuate service on the remaining defendants. Signed by District Judge Robert J. Conrad, Jr on 8/19/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pendergrass v. NC Department of Public Safety et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy T. Pendergrass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NC Department of Public Safety
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Medlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Tarrantina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Cranford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Rizaldi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Bradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Shope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FNU Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sami Hassan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.