Boyer v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Bobby Boyer
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2013cv00153
Filed: March 11, 2013
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Max O. Cogburn
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205 Denial Social Security Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 4, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 11 Motion for Summary Judgment; granting 12 Motion for Summary Judgment; affirming the decision of the Commissioner denying the relief sought by plaintiff. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/3/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
September 4, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court CLERK'S JUDGMENT is hereby entered in accordance with the Court's Order dated 9/3/2013. Signed by Clerk, Frank G. Johns. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
September 17, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 16 Motion for Reconsideration,and upon reconsideration, such Order is REAFFIRMED. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/16/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
September 24, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 20 MOTION Relief From Summary Judgment Under Rule 60(b)2. Signed by District Judge Max O. Cogburn, Jr on 9/24/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the North Carolina Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boyer v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bobby Boyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]