Caron v. Microsoft Corporation

Plaintiff: Robin Caron
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
 
Case Number: 3:2013cv00209
Filed: April 3, 2013
 
Court: North Carolina Western District Court
Office: Charlotte Office
County: Mecklenburg
Referring Judge: David S. Cayer
Presiding Judge: Frank D. Whitney
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 17, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER denying without prejudice 3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Frank D. Whitney on 5/17/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
July 2, 2013 18 Featured Case ORDER Consolidating Cases; denying (7) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim; denying (10) Motion to Remand; granting (15) Motion to Consolidate Cases. All further pleadings to be electronically filed to: 3:13-cv-209 only. Member Case: 3:13-cv-272 to be administratively closed. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 7/2/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(tmg)
October 9, 2013 25 Featured Case ORDER denying 17 Motion to Strike 16 Certification of Initial Attorneys Conference and Discovery Plan. Signed by Chief Judge Frank D. Whitney on 10/9/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)
November 19, 2013 31 Featured Case CONSENT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge David S. Cayer on 11/19/2013. (Pro se litigant served by US Mail.)(eef)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Caron v. Microsoft Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Caron
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Meredith Anne Pinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]